Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 08/01/2020 at 08:04:45 (UTC).

JERRY MONCIBAIZ V. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 JERRY MONCIBAIZ filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathryn Weston. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kathryn Weston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JERRY MONCIBAIZ

WARD TOULMIN BERG P A

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WARD T BERG

Attorney at WARD TOULMIN BERG P A

500 Canal Street

New Smyrna Beach, FL 32168

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL J STEWART

Office Of Deborah N Hartwell 111 N Orange Ave Ste 1600

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

07/30/2020 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/30/2020 : VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

ACCEPTANCE OF SETTLEMENT

07/22/2020 : ACCEPTANCE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF TAKING DEPOSITION

07/22/2020 : NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVICE

07/21/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

07/07/2020 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

06/09/2020 : NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/05/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/05/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

06/05/2020 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/05/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

06/05/2020 : NOTICE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/05/2020 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

03/16/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

02/05/2020 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/04/2020 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

02/03/2020 : COMPLAINT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej by Jerry Moncibaiz Instrument: 2020140751 Book: 7887 Page: 4619

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: ACCEPTANCE OF SETTLEMENT; Description: by Geico General Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: of Jerry Moncibaiz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of proposal for settlement by Jerry Moncibaiz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: of Jerry Moncibaiz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY; Description: to Open MRI of Daytona Beach,et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Jerry Moncibaiz by Geico General Insurance Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Jerry Moncibaiz by Geico General Insurance Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Geico General Insurance Co w/affirm defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Jerry Moncibaiz by Geico General Insurance Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Geico General Insurance Co of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Michael J Stewart,Esq obo Geico General Insurance Co and designation of email address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: CFO obo Geico General Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY fwd to pltf atty by e-service for sop cc pltf atty by e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Description: in excess of $30,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant