Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/28/2021 at 23:11:56 (UTC).

JEREMIAH R BENDER V. KIMBERLEIGH S HINKS BENDER

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 JEREMIAH R BENDER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KIMBERLEIGH S HINKS BENDER. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven C. Henderson and Alex Alvarez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********FMCI

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Steven C. Henderson

Alex Alvarez

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JEREMIAH R BENDER

Respondent

KIMBERLEIGH S HINKS BENDER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Alex Alvarez; Location: AAZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER FOR CASE MGMT CONF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MASTER/MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 408.00; Final Amount: 408.00; Credits: -408.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 3.50; Final Amount: 3.50; Credits: -3.50; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: to resp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACTION; Description: as to Kimberleigh S Hinks Bender copy to petitioner for publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION DILIGENT SEARCH / CONSTRUCTIVE SVC; Description: as Kimberleigh S Hinks Bender

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: permission Jeremiah R Bender

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: INFORMATION SHEET; Description: new suits checklist

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING SOCIAL SEC NUMBER; Description: Jeremiah R Bender

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: COPY OF ID/DRIVER'S LICENSE; Description: Jeremiah R Bender

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: AGREEMENT; Description: Relocation Long Distance Parenting Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less