Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 11/16/2020 at 13:47:24 (UTC).

JEFFREY MITCHELL, ET AL V. SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 JEFFREY MITCHELL filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Leah R. Case. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Leah R. Case

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JEFFREY MITCHELL

BARBARA MITCHELL

BUNDZA & RODRIGUEZ PA

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COREY A BUNDZA

444 Seabreeze Blvd Ste 890

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant Attorney

KELLY BARNES

1450 S Woodland Blvd 4Th Floor

Deland, FL 32720

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

11/03/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

10/30/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

10/30/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

10/30/2020 : NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE

10/30/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/07/2020 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/05/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/05/2020 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/05/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

10/05/2020 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/18/2020 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

09/16/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

09/10/2020 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

09/08/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/08/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/08/2020 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/08/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/08/2020 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Jeffrey Mitchell to req for production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Jeffrey Mitchell to req for admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: answers to 1st set of interrogs by Jeffrey Mitchell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Security First Ins Co to Pltf's request to produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Security First Ins Co to Pltf's request for admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Security First Ins Co of privilege Log

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of answers to Pltf's interrogs by Security First Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: NOTICE TO WITHDRAW; Description: w/out prej certain affirmative defenses by Security First

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: Jeffrey Mitchell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Jeffrey Mitchell by Security First Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: by CFO obo Security First Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY fwd to pltfs atty via e-service for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Security First Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Security First Ins Co by Jeffrey Mitchell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Security First Ins Co by Jeffrey Mitchell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Security First Ins Co by Jeffrey Mitchell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Security First Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLY BARNES