Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 09/07/2020 at 17:16:26 (UTC).

JAMIE ANN PETRI V. TIMOTHY JON PETRI

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 JAMIE ANN PETRI filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TIMOTHY JON PETRI. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Stasia Warren, Alex Alvarez and Steven C. Henderson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********FMCI

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Stasia Warren

Alex Alvarez

Steven C. Henderson

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JAMIE ANN PETRI

Respondent

TIMOTHY JON PETRI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ADAM WARREN

210 S Beach Street Suite 203

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • Docket(#77) Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Description: w/att'd supervised/safety focused parenting plan Instrument: 2020164253 Book: 7903 Page: 3675

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • Docket(#76) Docket Type: INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER; Description: Instrument: 2020164240 Book: 7903 Page: 3645

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docket(#75) Docket Type: RECEIPT; Description: for exhibits filed w/rec reten 08/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Non-Jury Trial; Court Officer: Steven C. Henderson; Location: SHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • Docket(#74) Docket Type: NON-JURY TRIAL SHEET; Description: 08/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • Docket(#73) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • Docket(#72) Docket Type: AMENDMENT/SUPPLEMENT TO; Description: pre trial compliance by pet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • Docket(#71) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: amended financial affidavit by pet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • Docket(#70) Docket Type: AMENDMENT/SUPPLEMENT TO; Description: 2nd, request to take judicial ntc by pet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket(#69) Docket Type: ORDER DENYING; Description: motion to continue

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2019
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To TIMOTHY JON PETRI orig/copy VCSO w/57.082, copy mailed to petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Description: Jamie Ann Petri

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: COPY OF ID/DRIVER'S LICENSE; Description: Jamie Ann Petri

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: AGREEMENT; Description: Parenting Plan signed by petitioner only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: INFORMATION SHEET; Description: new suits checklist

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF INSOLVENCY / INDIGENCY; Description: Jamie Ann Petri

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less