Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 02/24/2020 at 10:11:57 (UTC).

JACLYN LUMBERT LEVINE, ET AL V. SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/28/2019 JACLYN LUMBERT LEVINE filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathryn Weston. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kathryn Weston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JACLYN LUMBERT LEVINE

BOLTZ LEGAL

ERIK LUMBERT

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROOKE L BOLTZ

Boltz Legal 1221 E Broadway Street,Ste 1011

Oviedo, FL 32765

Defendant Attorney

AMBER MAYNARD

1900 Summit Tower Blvd Tower Place Ste 400

Orlando, FL 32810

 

Court Documents

MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/18/2019 : MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

DEMAND BY/FOR DEFENDANT

10/02/2019 : DEMAND BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/02/2019 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

09/25/2019 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

09/04/2019 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/04/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/04/2019 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/04/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

AMENDED MOTION/PETITION/COMPLAINT

09/04/2019 : AMENDED MOTION/PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/04/2019 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

08/30/2019 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/28/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

08/28/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/28/2019 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/28/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

08/28/2019 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

COMPLAINT

08/28/2019 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/28/2019 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej by Jaclyn Lumbert Levine & Eril Lumbert Instrument: 2020017928 Book: 7806 Page: 1893

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Jaclyn Lumbert Levine et al to enforce settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: DEMAND BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Security First Insurance Co for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Amber Maynard,Esq obo Security First Insurance Company and designation of email address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to complaint & discovery by Security First Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: (amd) Brooke Boltz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (amd) to Security First Ins Co by Jaclyn Lumbert Levine et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: (amd) to Security First Ins Co by Jaclyn Lumbert Levine et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: (amd) to Security First Ins Co by Jaclyn Lumbert Levine et al

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY ret to atty via e service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Security First Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Security First Ins Co by Jaclyn Lumbert Levine et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Security First Ins Co by Jaclyn Lumbert Levine et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Security First Ins Co by Jaclyn Lumbert Levine et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Brooke Boltz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOLTZ LEGAL is a litigant

Latest cases where Security First Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMBER MAYNARD