This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 05/18/2022 at 20:05:01 (UTC).

ISANTHES LLC V. WALTER A LONGNECKER, ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/29/2021 ISANTHES LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against WALTER A LONGNECKER. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Dennis Craig and Leah R. Case. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Dennis Craig

Leah R. Case

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ISANTHES LLC

TIFFANY & BOSCO P A

Winter Park, FL 32789

Defendants

WALTER A LONGNECKER

South Daytona, FL 32119

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1

South Daytona, FL 32119

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2

South Daytona, FL 32119

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WALTER A LONGNECKER

South Daytona, FL 32119

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA O B O INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

Tampa, FL 33602

CITY OF SOUTH DAYTONA

South Daytona, FL 32119

SUN COAST ROOFING & SOLAR

New Smyrna Beach, FL 32168

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATHRYN I KASPER

Attorney at TIFFANY & BOSCO P A

1201 S Orlando Ave Suite 430

Winter Park, FL 32789

Defendant Attorneys

BARRY E HUGHES

900 Big Tree Road

South Daytona, FL 32119

JOHN F RUDY III

400 N Tampa St Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602

STEPHANIE M VELO

Attorney at VOSE LAW FIRM LLP

324 W Morse Blvd

Winter Park, FL 32789

 

Court Documents

MEDIATION SUMMARY / DISPO. REPORT

04/14/2022 : MEDIATION SUMMARY / DISPO. REPORT

NOTICE OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION

04/04/2022 : NOTICE OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION

NOTICE OF SERVICE

02/16/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

ORDER OF/FOR DEFAULT

02/10/2022 : ORDER OF/FOR DEFAULT

ANSWER BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

02/08/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

02/04/2022 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

02/04/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

DISCLAIMER

01/24/2022 : DISCLAIMER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/20/2022 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST SUMMONS

11/29/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

11/29/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

11/29/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

11/29/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

11/29/2021 : CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

WORKSHEET

11/29/2021 : WORKSHEET

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

11/29/2021 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

11/29/2021 : COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/29/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Docket Type: MEDIATION SUMMARY / DISPO. REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION; Description: w/Viktoria Collins Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: Agreed order granting mtn for Judicial default as to Sun Coast Rooging and denying mtn for Judicial default as to Walter A Longnecker by Isanthes LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Docket Type: ORDER OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: as to Sun Coast Roofing & Solar and denying as to Walter A Longnecker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Isanthes LLC to Dfnt's answer to complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: (judicial) as to Walter A Longnecker and Sun Coast Roofing & Solar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Walter A Longnecker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Docket Type: DISCLAIMER; Description: by The United States of America

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Barry E Hughes Esq obo Walter A Longnecker w/designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Docket Type: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY; Description: Unk party in poss 1-2 and Unk spouse of Walter A Longnecker Instrument: 2022014509 Book: 8190 Page: 822

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to United States of America o/b/o Internal Revenue Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Unknown Spouse of Walter A Longnecker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Unknown Party in Possession 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Unknown Party in Possession 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Walter A Longnecker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: real property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2021287988 Book: 8164 Page: 3570

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUN COAST ROOFING & SOLAR is a litigant

Latest cases where ISANTHES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TIFFANY & BOSCO P.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant