This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 08/09/2022 at 18:25:22 (UTC).

INNATE CHIROPRACTIC HEALTHCARE P A DBA PLANTATION HEALTH AND WELLNESS PATIENT SHAWASHA GREENIDGE V. PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 INNATE CHIROPRACTIC HEALTHCARE P A DBA PLANTATION HEALTH AND WELLNESS PATIENT SHAWASHA GREENIDGE filed an Other lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wesley Heidt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wesley Heidt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

INNATE CHIROPRACTIC HEALTHCARE P A DBA PLANTATION HEALTH AND WELLNESS PATIENT SHAWASHA GREENIDGE

PLANTATION HEALTH AND WELLNESS

SHAWASHA GREENIDGE

GED LAWYERS LLP

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL R PRINCE

Attorney at GED LAWYERS LLP

7171 N Federal Hwy

Boca Raton, FL 33487

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

06/16/2022 : COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS

06/16/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

06/20/2022 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/05/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

07/21/2022 : NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

PREVIOUSLY FILED THROUGH PORTAL

07/21/2022 : PREVIOUSLY FILED THROUGH PORTAL

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

08/03/2022 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

08/03/2022 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej by Innate Chiropractic Healthcare PA etc Instrument: 2022184036 Book: 8294 Page: 1783 View: 2022184036

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: WHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled; Comments: Summons Exec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: PREVIOUSLY FILED THROUGH PORTAL; Description: Notice of Settlemetn by Innate Chiropractic Healthcare PA.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; Description: by Innate Chiropractic Healthcare PA.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: CFO obo Progressive American Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY Fwd to pltf's atty via e-service for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Progressive American Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Plantation Health And Wellness, LLC, is a litigant

Latest cases where GED LAWYERS LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRINCE , MICHAEL RYAN