This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/14/2022 at 22:18:28 (UTC).

INDIGO DEKALB TIC LLC AND INDIGO DEAN TIC LLC AS LANDLORD OF INDIGO PLANTATION APARTMENTS V. CODY M HAMMER

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 INDIGO DEKALB TIC LLC AND INDIGO DEAN TIC LLC AS LANDLORD OF INDIGO PLANTATION APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CODY M HAMMER. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

INDIGO DEKALB TIC LLC AND INDIGO DEAN TIC LLC AS LANDLORD OF INDIGO PLANTATION APARTMENTS

INDIGO DEAN TIC LLC

Defendant

CODY M HAMMER

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARLES V BARRETT III

307 S Fielding Ave

Tampa, FL 33606-4126

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/30/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

09/30/2021 : COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

REQUEST SUMMONS

10/01/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

10/01/2021 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

10/01/2021 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

10/06/2021 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

10/11/2021 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE

10/11/2021 : CLERK'S CERTIFICATE

MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

10/12/2021 : MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

10/27/2021 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

10/27/2021 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

10/27/2021 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

DEFAULT

11/04/2021 : DEFAULT

JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

11/04/2021 : JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

REQUEST FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

11/05/2021 : REQUEST FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

11/05/2021 : WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

RETURNED WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

11/15/2021 : RETURNED WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: RETURNED WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: exec by putting Danielle McKee in poss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: issd, fwd to VSO w/$90.00ck

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION; Description: by Indigo Dekalb TIC LLC w/$90ck

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: agst Cody M Hammer Instrument: 2021266669 Book: 8150 Page: 623

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Cody M Hammer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: by Court as to Cody M Hammer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Cody M Hammer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE; Description: reviewed deft's answer,no further action may be taken by the court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE; Description: of Answer but No Payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Cody Hammer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Cody M Hammer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: complaint and summons to CODY M HAMMER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To CODY M HAMMER Fwd to VSO w/80ck for sop, cc pltf's atty via e-service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To Cody Hammer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 185.00; Final Amount: 185.00; Credits: -185.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INDIGO DEAN TIC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where INDIGO DEKALB TIC LLC, A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY, D/B/A INDIGO PLANTATION APARTMENTS, A FOREIGH LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHARLES V BARRETT, III