This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 06/29/2022 at 07:52:20 (UTC).

IN THE INTEREST OF MADELINE HOPE WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 IN THE INTEREST OF MADELINE HOPE WILLIAMS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Margaret W. Hudson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********PRDL

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Margaret W. Hudson

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LYNN R WILLIAMS

Holly Hill, FL 32117

Not Classified By Court

MADELINE HOPE WILLIAMS

Daytona Beach, FL 32117

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JAMES PICKENS

Attorney at KINSEY VINCENT PYLE P L

150 S Palmetto Ave Ste 300

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Not Classified By Court Attorney

OFFICE OF CRIMINAL CONFLICT

& Civil Regional Counsel, 224 S Beach St Ste 201

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 4; Unit Amount: 1.00; Final Amount: 4.00; Credits: -4.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 2.00; Final Amount: 4.00; Credits: -4.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE; Description: of Mailing Order Determ. Incapacity

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Adjudicatory Hearing; Court Officer: Margaret W. Hudson; Location: DeLand; Status: Scheduled; Comments: Incapacity

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: ORDER DETERMINE / DETERMINING INCAPACITY; Description: Total Instrument: 2022151304 Book: 8275 Page: 305 View: 2022151304

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: NOTICE TO ALLEGED INCAPACITATED PERSON; Description: of Amended Petitions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: REPORT OF / BY; Description: The Office of Criminal Conflict and Civil Regional Counsel as Atty Elisor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: REPORT OF / BY EXAMINING COMMITTEE; Description: James Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: REPORT OF / BY EXAMINING COMMITTEE; Description: Angel R Epstein

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2022
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: NOTICE OF PETITION DETERMINE / DETERMINING INCAPACITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: and Designation of Email for William Gerson, Esq Asst Regional Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 231.00; Final Amount: 231.00; Credits: -231.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE; Description: of Mailing OR Apptg. Examining Committee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: ORDER; Description: Setting Hrg and Requiring Ntc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: ORDER APPOINTING EXAMINING COMMITTEE; Description: Bragg, Epstein and Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL TO ALLEGED INCAPACITATED PERSON; Description: The Office of Criminal Conflict & Civil Regional Counsel for Madeline Hope Williams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: ELECTRONIC MAIL OR NOTICE; Description: to JA notification of new case filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: Incapacity

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: PETITION DETERMINE / DETERMINING INCAPACITY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES PICKENS