This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/01/2022 at 01:14:42 (UTC).

IN RE: THE PETITION OF STEPHANIE LYNN BENEDICT

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 IN RE THE PETITION OF STEPHANIE LYNN BENEDICT was filed as a Family - Other Family lawsuit. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Alex Alvarez and Sandra C. Upchurch. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********FMCI

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Alex Alvarez

Sandra C. Upchurch

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STEPHANIE LYNN BENEDICT

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

Not Classified By Court

STEPHANIE LYNN WOHLFORD

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

JAMES PICKENS

Attorney at KINSEY VINCENT PYLE P L

150 S Palmetto Ave Ste 300

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR NAME CHANGE; Description: mail CC FJ to pet ** 1 env** Instrument: 2022046067 Book: 8210 Page: 1203

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REPORT OF FINDINGS OF GENERAL MASTER/MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: COPY; Description: of progress docket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Alex Alvarez; Location: AAZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER FOR CASE MGMT CONF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MASTER/MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: PETITION OF/FOR NAME CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES PICKENS