Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 07/01/2020 at 10:56:09 (UTC).

IN RE: THE PETITION OF NANCY FAVIOLA C GUEVARA

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 IN RE THE PETITION OF NANCY FAVIOLA C GUEVARA was filed as a Family - Other Family lawsuit. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven C. Henderson and Alex Alvarez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********FMCI

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Steven C. Henderson

Alex Alvarez

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NANCY FAVIOLA C GUEVARA

Not Classified By Court

NANCY FAVIOLA T GUEVARA

NANCY FAVIOLA TAYLOR GUEVARA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2020
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: to FDLE electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR NAME CHANGE; Description: mail CC FJ to pet Instrument: 2020108310 Book: 7865 Page: 3618

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: REPORT OF FINDINGS OF GENERAL MASTER/MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Alex Alvarez; Location: City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled; Comments: via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER FOR CASE MGMT CONF.; Description: amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Alex Alvarez; Location: CI309, City Island Courthouse; Status: Continued/Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: REPORT OF / BY; Description: FDLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER FOR CASE MGMT CONF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MASTER/MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: DISCLOSURE OF NON LAWYER FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE; Description: limitaiton of services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: INFORMATION SHEET; Description: new suits checklist

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: COPY OF ID/DRIVER'S LICENSE; Description: Nancy Faviola Cerritos Guevara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: PETITION OF/FOR NAME CHANGE; Description: FDLE required

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less