Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 06/19/2020 at 03:39:04 (UTC).

IN RE: THE PETITION OF GWENDOLYN JONES

Case Summary

On 02/25/2020 IN RE THE PETITION OF GWENDOLYN JONES was filed as a Family - Other Family lawsuit. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven C. Henderson and Alex Alvarez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********FMCI

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Steven C. Henderson

Alex Alvarez

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GWENDOLYN JONES

Respondents

MORTIKA AGNANT

VICTOR REDDING

Not Classified By Court

ZAYDEN REDDING

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2020
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: REPORT OF FINDINGS OF GENERAL MASTER/MAGISTRATE; Description: w/attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Alex Alvarez; Location: City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled; Comments: via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: MAIL RETURNED FROM; Description: by resp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER FOR CASE MGMT CONF.; Description: amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Alex Alvarez; Location: CI309, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: MAIL RETURNED FROM; Description: Mortika Agnant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Victor Redding 02/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER FOR CASE MGMT CONF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MASTER/MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2020
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: as to PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME (MINOR CHILD) To MORTIKA AGNANT orig/copies mailed to petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 0.00; Final Amount: 0.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 0.00; Final Amount: 0.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: INFORMATION SHEET; Description: new suits checklist

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: CONSENT; Description: Gwendolyn Jones

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: COPY OF ID/DRIVER'S LICENSE; Description: Gwendolyn Jones

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF INSOLVENCY / INDIGENCY; Description: Gwendolyn Jones

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: PETITION OF/FOR NAME CHANGE; Description: Minor Child FDLE required

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less