This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 03/22/2023 at 05:20:49 (UTC).

HIS & HERS ROOFING LLC AAO REBECCA SMITH V. STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 HIS HERS ROOFING LLC AAO REBECCA SMITH filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael S. Orfinger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Michael S. Orfinger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HIS & HERS ROOFING LLC AAO REBECCA SMITH

Defendant

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

Tallahassee, FL 32399-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JORDAN B FERTEL

Law Offices Of Robert David Malove, 200 Se 9Th Street

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

Defendant Attorney

MELANIE S WESEMAN

Attorney at ANDREU PALMA LAVIN & SOLIS PLLC

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408

 

Court Documents

HEARING SHEET

03/06/2023 : HEARING SHEET

NOTICE OF FILING

03/06/2023 : NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

03/03/2023 : NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

NOTICE TO WITHDRAW

12/22/2022 : NOTICE TO WITHDRAW

MOTION TO COMPEL

12/21/2022 : MOTION TO COMPEL

MOTION TO COMPEL

12/21/2022 : MOTION TO COMPEL

NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

12/14/2022 : NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

12/05/2022 : MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/05/2022 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

11/21/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

MOTION OF/FOR STAY/STAYING

11/04/2022 : MOTION OF/FOR STAY/STAYING

MOTION TO DISMISS / DISSOLVE

11/04/2022 : MOTION TO DISMISS / DISSOLVE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

11/04/2022 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

MOTION TO COMPEL

11/02/2022 : MOTION TO COMPEL

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

10/20/2022 : NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

10/07/2022 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/05/2022 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF FILING

09/22/2022 : NOTICE OF FILING

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Michael S. Orfinger; Location: MOZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled; Comments: Pltf's M/Compel Deposition(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Michael S. Orfinger; Location: D-413, DeLand; Status: Scheduled; Comments: Dfnt's Mtn to Dismiss and Mtn to Stay Discovery Pending Mtn to Dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28); Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27); Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: att'd Authority in support of response to Dfnt's Mtn to Dismiss by His & Hers Roofing LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25); Docket Type: NOTICE TO WITHDRAW; Description: pltf's mtn to compel dfnt's discovery & mtn to deem req for admissions admitted dtd 12/21/2022 by His & Hers Roofing LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24); Docket Type: MOTION TO COMPEL; Description: dfnt's discovery responses & mtn to deem req for admissions admitted by His & Hers Roofing LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23); Docket Type: MOTION TO COMPEL; Description: deposition of Dfnt's Corp Rep by His & Hers Roofing LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21); Docket Type: MOTION FOR SANCTIONS; Description: by His & Hers Roofing LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: CFO obo State Farm Florida Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY fwd to pltf's atty for SOP via eserve

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to State Farm Florida Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: of Dfnt's Designated Corporate Representative

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: of Dfnt's Inspector

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to State Farm Florida Insurance Company by His & Hers Roofing LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to State Farm Florida Insurance Company by His & Hers Roofing LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to State Farm Florida Insurance Company by His & Hers Roofing LLC etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less