This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 08/18/2022 at 10:19:52 (UTC).

HIS AND HERS ROOFING LLC A A O PRISCILLA & LAMAR THOMAS V. AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 HIS AND HERS ROOFING LLC A A O PRISCILLA LAMAR THOMAS filed an Other lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HIS AND HERS ROOFING LLC A A O PRISCILLA & LAMAR THOMAS

PRISCILLA THOMAS

LAMAR THOMAS

LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT DAVID MALOVE

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

Defendant

AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Tallahassee, FL 32399-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NADER O SARSOUR

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT DAVID MALOVE

200 Se 9Th Street

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

Defendant Attorney

ADRIAN V CHANDLER

Post Office Box 26349

Tampa, FL 33623

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

08/03/2022 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

08/01/2022 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING

07/18/2022 : NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

07/08/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

07/08/2022 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

07/08/2022 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

06/24/2022 : NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

MOTION TO COMPEL

06/21/2022 : MOTION TO COMPEL

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

06/13/2022 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

REQUEST SUMMONS

05/20/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/20/2022 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/20/2022 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/20/2022 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/20/2022 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/20/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

05/20/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

COMPLAINT

05/20/2022 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/20/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22); Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej by His & Hers Roofing LLC etc Instrument: 2022182921 Book: 8293 Page: 3167 View: 2022182921

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: ADZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled; Comments: M/Compel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20); Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING; Description: by His & Her Roofing LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19); Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: American Integrity Ins Co of Florida w/affirmative defenses and demand for jury trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to discovery by American Integrity Ins Co of Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: American Integrity Ins Co of Florida to pltfs admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: MOTION TO COMPEL; Description: depositions by His and Hers Roofing LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to complaint by American Integrity Ins Co of Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: to AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA fwd to pltfs atty by mail for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to American Integrity Ins Co of Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: of defs corp rep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: of defs inspector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to American Integrity Ins Co of Florida by His and Hers Roofing LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to American Integrity Ins Co of Florida by His and Hers Roofing LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to American Integrity Ins Co of Florida by His and Hers Roofing LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Nader O Sarsour

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Integrity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADRIAN CHANDLER