Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 10/03/2020 at 00:38:08 (UTC).

HILDA E VEGA VAZQUEZ V. MANUEL VAZQUEZ SENIOR

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 HILDA E VEGA VAZQUEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MANUEL VAZQUEZ SENIOR. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven C. Henderson and Alex Alvarez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********FMCI

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Steven C. Henderson

Alex Alvarez

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HILDA E VEGA VAZQUEZ

Respondent

MANUEL VAZQUEZ SENIOR

Not Classified By Court

HILDA EVERLIDIS VEGA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SASHA O GARCIA

600 Jennings Avenue

Eustis, FL 32726

Respondent Attorney

SETH SCHWARTZ

10365 Hood Rd Ste 105

Jacksonville, FL 32257

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Steven C. Henderson; Location: SHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Alex Alvarez; Location: AAZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled; Comments: #17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Alex Alvarez; Location: AAZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docket(#42) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF HEARING; Description: by pet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docket(#41) Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Description: Instrument: 2020186589 Book: 7919 Page: 1299

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • Docket(#40) Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIEN; Description: by atty Seth Schwartz Instrument: 2020177604 Book: 7913 Page: 1471

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • Docket(#39) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: att'd FL DL by pet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docket(#38) Docket Type: MEDIATION SUMMARY / DISPO. REPORT; Description: the parties attended the scheduled mediation & an agreement was signed at mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • Docket(#37) Docket Type: MAIL RETURNED FROM; Description: resp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • Docket(#36) Docket Type: NOTICE BY/FOR PETITIONER; Description: of supplemental production

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 408.00; Final Amount: 408.00; Credits: -408.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • Docket(#8.5) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE DIST PARENTING NOTICE/STANDING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: as to Petition for Dissolution of Marriage To MANUEL VAZQUEZ SENIOR orig to Atty via e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS; Description: by Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING SOCIAL SEC NUMBER; Description: Pet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less