Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 05/08/2020 at 16:18:31 (UTC).

HEATHER EVERHART V. DANIEL CHARLES RYAN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 HEATHER EVERHART filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DANIEL CHARLES RYAN. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher Kelly and Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Christopher Kelly

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HEATHER EVERHART

Defendants

RAYMON NORTHUP

SANDRA NORTHUP

DANIEL CHARLES RYAN

 

Court Documents

HEARING SHEET

10/15/2019 : HEARING SHEET

ORDER RESETTING / RESCHEDULING

09/23/2019 : ORDER RESETTING / RESCHEDULING

NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

08/27/2019 : NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

08/26/2019 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

MOTION BY/FOR DEFENDANT

08/26/2019 : MOTION BY/FOR DEFENDANT

ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

05/02/2019 : ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

05/02/2019 : STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

COURT NOTES

05/02/2019 : COURT NOTES

RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

05/01/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS UNEXECUTED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

04/04/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

04/04/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

03/26/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

03/26/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

03/26/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

03/22/2019 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

03/22/2019 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/22/2019 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

INFORMATION SHEET

03/22/2019 : INFORMATION SHEET

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: D-312, DeLand; Status: Scheduled; Comments: motion deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: D-312, DeLand; Status: Cancelled; Comments: M/Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: ORDER RESETTING / RESCHEDULING; Description: Hearing of 9/25.2019 rescheduled to 10/15/2019 @ 9:30am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: MOTION RESETTING / RESCHEDULING; Description: FAX Hearing on 9/25/19 by Sandra Northup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING; Description: by judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: Sandra Northrup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: MOTION BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Sandra Northrup et al to deposit monies into court registry because August payment was returned by mail and unable to forward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Voided; Comments: VOID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: 1, DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To SANDRA NORTHUP fwd to VCSO w/ ck #93 for $80 for SOP cc pltf via mail/e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To RAYMON NORTHUP fwd to VCSO w/ ck #93 for $80 for SOP cc pltf via mail/e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To DANIEL CHARLES RYAN fwd to BrevardCSO w/ ck #600607047 for $40 for SOP cc pltf via mail/e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 3; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 30.00; Credits: -30.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 3.50; Final Amount: 3.50; Credits: -3.50; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Heather Everhart

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Daniel Charles Ryan et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less