This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/14/2023 at 21:01:10 (UTC).

GULF HARBOUR INVESTMENTS CORPORATION V. JANET MAE BUTCHER, ETC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/03/2021 GULF HARBOUR INVESTMENTS CORPORATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JANET MAE BUTCHER, ETC ,. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Dennis Craig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Dennis Craig

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GULF HARBOUR INVESTMENTS CORPORATION

MCCALLA RAYMER LEIBERT PIERCE LLC

Defendants

JANET MAE BUTCHER

JANET HARRISON

TRAILS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

HAROLD BEMIS

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JANET MAE BUTCHER A K A JANET BUTCHER A K A JANET MAE HARRISON

Not Classified By Court

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SARA COLLINS

 

Court Documents

MAIL RETURNED FROM

09/16/2022 : MAIL RETURNED FROM

MAIL RETURNED FROM

09/16/2022 : MAIL RETURNED FROM

MAIL RETURNED FROM

09/16/2022 : MAIL RETURNED FROM

MAIL RETURNED FROM

08/08/2022 : MAIL RETURNED FROM

RECEIPT

08/08/2022 : RECEIPT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

08/03/2022 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ORDER TO RELEASE / RELEASING

07/28/2022 : ORDER TO RELEASE / RELEASING

MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

07/28/2022 : MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

DEFAULT

05/19/2022 : DEFAULT

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/03/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/03/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

12/03/2021 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/03/2021 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

12/03/2021 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

CERTIFICATE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/03/2021 : CERTIFICATE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

WORKSHEET

12/03/2021 : WORKSHEET

COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

12/03/2021 : COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/03/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50); Docket Type: MAIL RETURNED FROM; Description: Current Residents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49); Docket Type: MAIL RETURNED FROM; Description: Unknown Spouse of Janet Mae Butcher etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48); Docket Type: MAIL RETURNED FROM; Description: Janet Mae Butcher aka Janet Butcher aka Janet Mae Harrison

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47); Docket Type: MAIL RETURNED FROM; Description: The Trails Homeowners Assoc Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46); Docket Type: RECEIPT; Description: of orig docs by Katie Wilshaw obo McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: original note of filing, note, allonge to note & mortgage to McCalla Raymer Liebert Pierce LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44); Docket Type: ORDER TO RELEASE / RELEASING; Description: Original loan documents dismissing action and releasing the lis pendens Instrument: 2022180404 Book: 8292 Page: 384 View: 2022180404

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43); Docket Type: MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Gulf Harbour Investments Corp to release Original Loan Documents dismiss action and release the lis pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42); Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to The Trails Homeowners Association Inc, Harold Bemis, Jamet Mae Butcher etc & Unkn Spouse of Janet Mae Butcher etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41); Docket Type: NOTE, CONTRACT, OR MORTGAGE; Description: (orig) and mtg

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to The Trails Homeowners Association, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Janet Mae Butcher etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation w/o prop order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY; Description: by Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Sara Collins, Esq.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2021292674 Book: 8167 Page: 3568 View: 2021292674

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation of Original Note of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: Real Property

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less