This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 02/25/2022 at 20:54:09 (UTC).

GUARDIANSHIP OF AVION XAVIER HOLLEY, A MINOR

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 GUARDIANSHIP OF AVION XAVIER HOLLEY, A MINOR was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Margaret W. Hudson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********PRDL

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Margaret W. Hudson

 

Party Details

Guardian Ad Litem

MARY VIVIAN FUENTES

Deltona, FL 32725

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Guardian Ad Litem Attorney

HARLAN L PAUL

Attorney at PAUL ELKIND BRANZ & KELTON P A

142 E New York Ave

Deland, FL 32724-5504

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING INVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: AUDIT INVENTORY; Description: follow up

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: NOTICE OF INTENT; Description: to file Acctg on Calendar Yr basis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: ORDER DENYING; Description: Inventory *E-svd w/audit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: AUDIT INVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: INVENTORY TIER 1; Description: *audited

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: RECEIPT FOR/OF DEPOSITORY; Description: Mainstreet Community Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: LETTER(S) OF/BY GUARDIAN; Description: Mary Vivian Fuentes Instrument: 2021116332 Book: 8050 Page: 1634

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: ORDER APPOINTING OF/BY GUARDIAN; Description: Mary Vivian Fuentes, Minor Property, Restricted *69.031* Instrument: 2021113502 Book: 8048 Page: 1928

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Margaret W. Hudson; Location: Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled; Comments: Appt of Gdn (minor prop)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: HEARING SHEET; Description: grants Order Appoint Gdn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: ORDER; Description: Setting Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: Gdn Minor Property

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: ELECTRONIC MAIL OR NOTICE; Description: to JA re:notification of new case filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: OATH OF/BY DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE; Description: Atty Harlan L Paul by Mary Vivian Fuentes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: APPLICATION OF/BY GUARDIAN; Description: Mary Vivian Fuentes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: PETITION OF/BY GUARDIAN; Description: Minor Property

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less