Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 09/25/2020 at 07:46:38 (UTC).

GSD CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC A/A/O MICHAEL PERRY V. HOMEOWNERS CHOICE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/07/2019 GSD CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC A/A/O MICHAEL PERRY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against HOMEOWNERS CHOICE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathryn Weston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kathryn Weston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GSD CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC A/A/O MICHAEL PERRY

BUSH LAW GROUP LLC

MICHAEL PERRY

Defendant

HOMEOWNERS CHOICE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHELDON DONNIE WORRELL

6622 Southpoint Drive S Ste 190

Jacksonville, FL 32216

Defendant Attorneys

NICHOLAS A LEROY

Attorney at COLE SCOTT & KISSANE PA

1900 Summit Tower Blvd Ste 400

Orlando, FL 32810

JESSICA L LASLO

Attorney at COLE SCOTT & KISSANE PA

1900 Summit Tower Blvd Ste 400

Orlando, FL 32810

ANDRAYA K JACKSON

Tower Place Suite 400 1900 Summit Tower Boulevard

Orlando, FL 32810

SADE SHAKILA OYINLOYE JACKSON

1900 Summit Tower Blvd Tower Place,Ste 400

Orlando, FL 32810

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/23/2020 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/24/2020 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ORDER OF/FOR HEARING

06/19/2020 : ORDER OF/FOR HEARING

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

05/12/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

05/08/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

MOTION TO COMPEL

05/07/2020 : MOTION TO COMPEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/16/2020 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/29/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/29/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/29/2020 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/21/2020 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

09/20/2019 : MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

09/12/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

DEMAND BY/FOR DEFENDANT

07/24/2019 : DEMAND BY/FOR DEFENDANT

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

07/22/2019 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

06/28/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/15/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

05/15/2019 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: Nicholas A LeRoy and Sade Shakila Oyinloye Jackson obo Homeowners Choice Property etc and email designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: Nicholas A LeRoy and Sade Shakila Oyinloye Jackson obo Homeowners Choice Property etc and email designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Kathryn Weston; Location: DeLand; Status: Cancelled; Comments: dfnt's mtn to compel discovery responses(via Zoom)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: (Amended) of Nicholas A LeRoy Esq and Andraya K Jackson Esq obo Homeowners Choice Property & Casualty Insurance Co Inc w/designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Homeowners Choice Property & Casualty Ins Co Inc w/affirmative defenses and demand for jury trial as to amd complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Docket Type: NOTICE TO WITHDRAW; Description: mtn to dismiss/mtn for more definite statement by Homeowners Choice Property & Casualty Ins Co Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING; Description: by Homewoeners Choice Property & Casualty Ins Co Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR COMPLIANCE; Description: with first request for production by GSD Construction Services LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Docket Type: ORDER OF/FOR HEARING; Description: by Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: GSD Construction Services LLC etc to 1st req for production

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY; Description: CFO obo Homeowners Choice Property & Casualty Ins Co Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Homeowners Choice Property and Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Homeowners Choice Property and Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Sheldon Donnie Worrell, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To HOMEOWNERS CHOICE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY fwd to pltf's atty via mail for SOP cc pltf's atty via mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Homeowners Choice Property and Casualty Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gsd Construction Services Llc is a litigant

Latest cases where Homeowners Choice Property and Casualty Insurance is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEROY NICHOLAS A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACKSON ANDRAYA K