This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 09/30/2021 at 18:48:29 (UTC).

GRANT CHASE JONES V. CITY OF DAYTONA BEACH, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 GRANT CHASE JONES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF DAYTONA BEACH. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Mary G. Jolley and Michael S. Orfinger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Mary G. Jolley

Michael S. Orfinger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GRANT CHASE JONES

OGLE LAW LLC

Defendants

FATHER LOPEZ CATHOLIC HIGH SCHOOL INC

JOHN NOONAN

CITY OF DAYTONA BEACH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM H OGLE

444 Seabreeze Blvd Ste 800

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

Defendant Attorneys

KEVIN W SHAUGHNESSY

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

200 S Orange Ave Ste 2300

Orlando, FL 32802-0112

TAYLOR HARDUVEL

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

200 S Orange Avenue Ste 2300

Orlando, FL 32802-0112

GARY M GLASSMAN

C/O City Of Daytona Beach Po Box 2451

Daytona Beach, FL 32115-2451

BRANDON T BYERS

Po Box 2451

Daytona Beach, FL 32115-2451

 

Court Documents

REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/26/2020 : REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

02/24/2020 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

AMENDED MOTION/PETITION/COMPLAINT

02/04/2020 : AMENDED MOTION/PETITION/COMPLAINT

ORDER

01/22/2020 : ORDER

NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

09/24/2019 : NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

07/22/2019 : NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

05/31/2019 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

AMENDED MOTION/PETITION/COMPLAINT

05/31/2019 : AMENDED MOTION/PETITION/COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT

01/28/2019 : COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • Docket(#52) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (3rd) to Father Lopez cacholic High School Inc by Grant Chase Jones

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Docket(#51) Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • Docket(#50) Docket Type: OBJECTION BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: (and responses) Father Lopez Catholic High School Inc to 2nd req for production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docket(#49) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (2nd) to Father Lopez Catholic High School Inc by Grant Chanse Jones

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docket(#48) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Brandon T Byers Esq obo City of Daytona Beach

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • Docket(#47) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Father Lopez Catholic High School Inc to pltfs req for production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Docket Type: REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Description: Grant-Chase Jones

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Father Lopez Catholic High School Inc w/affirmative defenses and demand for jury trial to 2nd amd complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket(#44) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: Taylor A Haruvel obo Father Lopez Catholic High School Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket(#43) Docket Type: ORDER FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: Father Lopez Catholic High School Inc shall have until 2/24/20 to respond to 2nd amd complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2019
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: PROPOSED TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To JOHN NOONAN, AS BISHOP OF THE DIOCESE OF ORLANDO, HIS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS IN OFFICE, A CORPORATION SOLE fwd to pltf's atty via e-service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To FATHER LOPEZ CATHOLIC HIGH SCHOOL INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION fwd to pltf's atty via e-service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To THE CITY OF DAYTONA BEACH fwd to pltf's atty via e-service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Father Lopez Catholic High School, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to The Diocese of Orlando

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to City of Daytona Beach

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Grant-Chase Jones w/o prop order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OGLE WILLIAM H