This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 05/23/2022 at 15:25:02 (UTC).

GEORGE SNYDER, ETC. V. AMANDA GOODREAU

Case Summary

On 04/21/2022 GEORGE SNYDER, ETC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against AMANDA GOODREAU. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEORGE SNYDER

Debary, FL 32713

Defendant

AMANDA GOODREAU

Debary, FL 32713

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT / DISTRIBUTION

05/18/2022 : MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT / DISTRIBUTION

ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

05/17/2022 : ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT

STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

05/16/2022 : STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

ORDER OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION

05/10/2022 : ORDER OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION

NOTICE OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION

05/09/2022 : NOTICE OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION

MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

05/03/2022 : MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

05/02/2022 : NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

05/02/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

05/02/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

04/29/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

04/21/2022 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

04/21/2022 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

04/21/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

CONSENT BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

04/21/2022 : CONSENT BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

04/21/2022 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

04/21/2022 : COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/21/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

INFORMATION SHEET

04/21/2022 : INFORMATION SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT / DISTRIBUTION; Description: funds by George Snyder

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING STIPULATION or SETTLEMENT; Description: Instrument: 2022121123 Book: 8256 Page: 4278

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S); Description: agst Amanda Goodreau Instrument: 2022121114 Book: 8256 Page: 4263

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: ORDER OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION; Description: w/Seventh Circuity County Mediation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION; Description: w/SCCMediation@circuit7.org

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE; Description: crt has reviewed defs answer & deposit; mediation/NJ will be scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 1200.00; Final Amount: 1200.00; Credits: -1200.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 25.50; Final Amount: 25.50; Credits: -25.50; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT; Description: by Amanda Goodreau, $1,225.50 ($1,200.00 rent + $25.50 deposit fee)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Amanda Goodreau

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 3.50; Final Amount: 3.50; Credits: -3.50; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 5.00; Final Amount: 5.00; Credits: -5.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: complaint and summons to AMANDA GOODREAU

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To AMANDA GOODREAU fwd to VSO w/ck #153 $40.00 for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by George Snyder

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: CONSENT BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: George Snyder to close case after 90 days inactivity

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Amanda goodreau

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: poss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less