Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 10/21/2020 at 00:15:03 (UTC).

GARY DEMARCO V. ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/12/2019 GARY DEMARCO filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Randell H. Rowe, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Randell H. Rowe, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARY DEMARCO

VICKARYOUS LAW FIRM

SNEDAKER LAW PLLC

Defendants

HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHANNON P SNEDAKER

Attorney at SNEDAKER LAW PLLC

142 W Lakeview Avenue Ste 2040

Lake Mary, FL 32746

Defendant Attorneys

DONNA ZMIJEWSKI

4000 Hollywood Blvd Ste 501 South

Hollywood, FL 33021

AMANDA E WRIGHT

Offices Of Robert J Smith 390 N Orange Ave Ste 895

Orlando, FL 32801-1635

RYAN J HAYES

Law Offices Of Robert J Smith 390 N Orange Ave Ste 895

Orlando, FL 32801-1635

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

10/09/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/30/2020 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR COPIES

04/20/2020 : REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE

04/07/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

04/07/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE

04/06/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF TAKING DEPOSITION

02/25/2020 : NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/18/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO/FOR TAKING PHYSICAL EXAM.

11/25/2019 : REQUEST TO/FOR TAKING PHYSICAL EXAM.

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/19/2019 : NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

09/30/2019 : STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

ORDER APPOINTING

08/02/2019 : ORDER APPOINTING

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

04/15/2019 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/10/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

04/10/2019 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

04/03/2019 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

REQUEST SUMMONS

02/12/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

02/12/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

87 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Randell H. Rowe, III; Location: Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled; Comments: M/Discharge Atty Lien

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Jury Trial; Court Officer: Randell H. Rowe, III; Location: 4A, DeLand; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Docket Sounding; Court Officer: Randell H. Rowe, III; Location: DeLand; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej as to Hartford Ins Co of the Midwest ONLY by Gary Demarco Instrument: 2020197052 Book: 7926 Page: 1966

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) Docket Type: ORDER GRANTING; Description: (AGREED) dfts mtn to enforce settlement, pltf has 10 days to file dismissal w/prej as to Hartford, Clerk shall NOT CLOSE file upon dismissal of Hartford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Randell H. Rowe, III; Location: DeLand; Status: Scheduled; Comments: (zoom) mtn to enforce settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) Docket Type: HEARING SHEET; Description: zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING; Description: *amended as to certificate of service only*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) Docket Type: MOTION; Description: to discharge Attorney Lien by Shannon P Snedaker Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 20.00; Credits: -20.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST ret to atty via e service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ret to atty via e service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Hartford etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Allstate etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Gary Demarco w/prop Or

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHANNON SNEDAKER