This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 03/08/2022 at 01:57:14 (UTC).

GARY A WOODS, ET AL V. ASHLEY THORP

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 GARY A WOODS, filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ASHLEY THORP. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LINDA L WOODS

PAUL ELKIND BRANZ & PAUL LLP

Deland, FL 32724

GARY A WOODS

Defendant

ASHLEY THORP

Edgewater, FL 32132

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARLAN G PAUL

142 East New York Avenue

Deland, FL 32724

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/04/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

05/04/2021 : COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

05/04/2021 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST SUMMONS

05/04/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

05/05/2021 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

05/05/2021 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

05/13/2021 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

05/19/2021 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

DEFAULT

05/24/2021 : DEFAULT

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

05/27/2021 : MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

06/02/2021 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

06/03/2021 : FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

06/07/2021 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

06/08/2021 : WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

RETURNED WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

06/17/2021 : RETURNED WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: RETURNED WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: exec turned over to Gary Woods

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: issd fwd to VSO w/ ck#27118 $90.00 for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: (default) agst Ashley Thorp Instrument: 2021133125 Book: 8061 Page: 3714

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Ashley Thorp

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: by Gary A Woods,et al

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Ashley Thorp

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: as to Ashley Thorp w/prop default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Ashley Thorp

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 185.00; Final Amount: 185.00; Credits: -185.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 5.00; Final Amount: 5.00; Credits: -5.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: complaint and summons to ASHLEY THORP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To ASHLEY THORP fwd to pltfs atty via eservice for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Ashley Thorp

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Harlan G Paul

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: poss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less