This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 06/03/2022 at 14:55:24 (UTC).

FRANCIS ZAIDIVET RAMOSFIGUEROA V. RG AMBULANCE SERVICE INC DBA AMERICAN AMBULANCE, ETC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 FRANCIS ZAIDIVET RAMOSFIGUEROA filed an Other lawsuit against RG AMBULANCE SERVICE INC DBA AMERICAN AMBULANCE, ETC ,. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Randell H. Rowe, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Randell H. Rowe, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FRANCIS ZAIDIVET RAMOSFIGUEROA

PIKE & LUSTIG LLP

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Defendants

RG AMBULANCE SERVICE INC DBA AMERICAN AMBULANCE

Miami, FL 33147

HALIFAX MEDICAL CENTER AUXILIARY INC DBA HALIFAX MEDICAL CENTER

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

HALIFAX HEALTH CARE SYSTEMS INC

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

FLORIDA HOSPITAL MEDICAL GROUP INC DBA RADIOLOGY SPECIALISTS OF FLORIDA

Altamonte Springs, FL 32714

COLLECTION INFORMATION BUREAU INC

Lake Worth, FL 33460

HALIFAX PATHOLOGY ASSOCIATIONS PA

Deleon Springs, FL 32130

ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM/SUNBELT INC DBA ADVENTHEALTH ORLANDO

Altamonte Springs, FL 32714

NORTH AMERICAN CREDIT SERVICES INC

Nashville, TN 37203

Not Classified By Court

AMERICAN AMBULANCE

HALIFAX MEDICAL CENTER

RADIOLOGY SPECIALISTS OF FLORIDA

ADVENTHEALTH ORLANDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL J PIKE

Attorney at PIKE & LUSTIG LLP

1209 N Olive Ave

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Defendant and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

MICHAEL A COSTELLO

Hightower Stratton Novigrod, 151 Southhall Lane Ste 140

Maitland, FL 32751

HOLLY WOERSCHING ZITZKA

Cobb Cole, Post Office Box 2491

Daytona Beach, FL 32115-2491

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

05/05/2021 : COMPLAINT

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

05/10/2021 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE

06/10/2021 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF SERVICE

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

11/01/2021 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

11/01/2021 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

11/01/2021 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Randell H. Rowe, III; Location: DeLand; Status: Scheduled; Comments: pltfsm tn for final equitable distribution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • Docket(#52) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • Docket(#51) Docket Type: MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT / DISTRIBUTION; Description: by Francis Zaidivet Ramos Figueroa

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • Docket(#50) Docket Type: DEFAULT JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: directing payment **SEE ORDER** Instrument: 2022055904 Book: 8216 Page: 3821

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • Docket(#49) Docket Type: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: (default) by Francis Zaidivet Ramos Figueroa

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • Docket(#48) Docket Type: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY; Description: Halifax Pathology Assoc PA and Collection Information Bureau Inc Instrument: 2022042965 Book: 8208 Page: 1840

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • Docket(#47) Docket Type: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Description: by Holly W Zitzka Esq

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Docket(#46) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to North American Credit Services Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Docket(#45) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Adventist Health System/Sunbelt Inc etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Docket(#44) Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Florida Hospital Medical Group Inc etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to North American Credit Services Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Adventist Health System/Sunbelt Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Collection Information Bureau Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Halifax Pathology Associates PA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Florida Hospital Medical Group Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Halifax Health Care Systems Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Haliax Medical Center Auxiliary Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to RG Ambulance Service Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less