This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 10/05/2020 at 14:33:09 (UTC).

FOOD SUPPLY V. RON PETRILLO

Case Summary

On 09/15/2020 FOOD SUPPLY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RON PETRILLO. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Dawn P. Fields. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Dawn P. Fields

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOOD SUPPLY

Defendant

RON PETRILLO

 

Court Documents

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

09/17/2020 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

09/15/2020 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/15/2020 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

INFORMATION SHEET

09/15/2020 : INFORMATION SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Dawn P. Fields; Location: DFZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: COPY OF LETTER; Description: to Brevard County Sheriff's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To RON PETRILLO Fwd to Brevard Sheriff w/ck #120420 $40 for sop, cc pltf by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Food Supply

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less