Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 07/04/2020 at 17:57:39 (UTC).

FLORIDA PAIN & WELLNESS CENTER INC, ETC. V. WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 FLORIDA PAIN WELLNESS CENTER INC, ETC filed an Other lawsuit against WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Dawn P. Fields. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Dawn P. Fields

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SIMOES DAVILA PLLC

FLORIDA PAIN & WELLNESS CENTER INC

JUAN BEAUCHAMP

Defendant

WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBERLY P SIMOES

Attorney at SIMOES DAVILA PLLC

910 Sw 1St Ave Ste 201

Ocala, FL 34474

Defendant Attorney

CRAIG A BEVERLY II

Attorney at WINDHAVEN CLAIMS MANAGEMENT LLC

P O Box 269015

Miami, FL 33126

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/15/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

02/04/2020 : NOTICE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

COURT NOTES

01/14/2020 : COURT NOTES

NOTICE OF FILING

01/06/2020 : NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE OF FILING

01/06/2020 : NOTICE OF FILING

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

12/19/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

DEMAND BY/FOR DEFENDANT

12/06/2019 : DEMAND BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/06/2019 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

11/26/2019 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

11/25/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

COMPLAINT

11/25/2019 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/25/2019 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (suppl) to Windhaven Insurance Company by Florida Pain & Wellness Centers Inc etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: NOTICE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Windhaven Insurance Company for mandatory stay of proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Dawn P. Fields; Location: CI-10, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: order appt the Florida Department of Financial Services as receiver by Windhaven Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: order of rehabilitation, injunction & auto stay by Windhaven Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY; Description: CFO State of Florida obo Windhaven Insurance Company emailed 12-06-2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: DEMAND BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Windhaven Insurance Co for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Craig A Beverly II,Esq obo Windhaven Insurance Company and designation of email address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY fwd to pltf atty via e-service for sop; cc pltf atty via e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Windhaven Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA PAIN & WELLNESS CENTERS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Windhaven Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIMBERLY P SIMOES