This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 03/14/2023 at 02:10:44 (UTC).

FLORIDA ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES P A AS ASSIGNEE OF PATRICIA LOWRY V. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/27/2022 FLORIDA ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES P A AS ASSIGNEE OF PATRICIA LOWRY filed an Other lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Rachel D. Myers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Rachel D. Myers

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLORIDA ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES P A AS ASSIGNEE OF PATRICIA LOWRY

PATRICIA LOWRY

PAUL ELKIND BRANZ & PAUL LLP

Deland, FL 32724

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Tallahassee, FL 32399-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DARREN ELKIND

Attorney at PAUL ELKIND BRANZ & PAUL LLP

142 E New York Ave

Deland, FL 32724

Defendant Attorney

MARIANGELA DE GIORGIO

Mimi L Smith & Associates, 250 S Orange Avenue, Ste 600

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/27/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/27/2022 : COMPLAINT

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/27/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/27/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/27/2022 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/27/2022 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/27/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

12/29/2022 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

01/05/2023 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/03/2023 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

02/03/2023 : NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

02/03/2023 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

NOTICE OF SERVICE

02/17/2023 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

02/17/2023 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

02/17/2023 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

02/17/2023 : NOTICE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

02/20/2023 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Rachel D. Myers; Location: RYZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Rachel D. Myers; Location: RYZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co w/affirm defenses and Demand for Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: NOTICE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co of Privilege Log

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co to Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co to Request for Production

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of answers to interrogs by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to the complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Description: by Mariangela De Giorgio,Esq

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Mariangela De Diorgio,Esq obo State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co and designation of email address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 80.00; Final Amount: 80.00; Credits: -80.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY rtn to atty via eservice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: (1st) to State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co by Florida Orthopaedic Associates PA etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co by Florida Orthopaedic Associates PA etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co by Florida Orthopaedic Associates PA etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: Darren J Elkind

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less