This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 03/12/2023 at 00:36:37 (UTC).

FLORIDA ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES P A AS ASSIGNEE OF ALICIA GUARDIA V. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/13/2022 FLORIDA ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES P A AS ASSIGNEE OF ALICIA GUARDIA filed an Other lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Rachel D. Myers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Rachel D. Myers

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLORIDA ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES P A AS ASSIGNEE OF ALICIA GUARDIA

ALICIA GUARDIA

PAUL ELKIND BRANZ & PAUL LLP

Deland, FL 32724

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Tallahassee, FL 32399-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DARREN ELKIND

Attorney at PAUL ELKIND BRANZ & PAUL LLP

142 E New York Ave

Deland, FL 32724

Defendant Attorney

JEFFREY G REGENSTREIF

Taylor Day Grimm & Boyd, 50 North Laura Street Suite 3500

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/13/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/13/2022 : COMPLAINT

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

09/13/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/13/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/13/2022 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/13/2022 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

09/13/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

09/14/2022 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

09/20/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/10/2022 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

10/10/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

10/10/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

10/28/2022 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

10/28/2022 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE

10/28/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF FILING

10/28/2022 : NOTICE OF FILING

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Rachel D. Myers; Location: RYZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Rachel D. Myers; Location: RYZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled; Comments: Summons Exec

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: attd certified copy of policy of insurance by State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: answers to interrogs by State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co to req for admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co to req for production

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co w/affirm defenses and Demand for Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Jeffrey G Regenstreif,Esq

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Jeffrey G Regenstreif,Esq obo State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: by CFO obo State Farm Mutual Auto Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY Frwd to Pltf's Atty via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: To State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co by FL Ortho Assocs PA etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: To State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co by FL Ortho Assocs PA etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: To State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co by FL Ortho Assocs PA etc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: By Darren J Elkind Esq

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less