Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/27/2020 at 01:05:44 (UTC).

FL DEPT OF REVENUE AFDC, ET AL V. SEAN BEHAGEN

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 FL DEPT OF REVENUE AFDC filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against SEAN BEHAGEN. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven C. Henderson and Neal Coffman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********FMCI

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Steven C. Henderson

Neal Coffman

 

Party Details

Petitioners

FL DEPT OF REVENUE AFDC

ROSETTA BAILEY

Respondent

SEAN BEHAGEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHARLES W RUPPEL

P.O. Box 2200

Daytona Beach, FL 32115

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2020
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER; Description: Instrument: 2020061344 Book: 7833 Page: 2922

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: ORDER FOR SUPPORT; Description: Instrument: 2020061342 Book: 7833 Page: 2918

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Neal Coffman; Location: CI-8, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled; Comments: pet for support & other relief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: CH / SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: NOTICE OF HEARING AND TO PRODUCE; Description: to resp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: resp 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: to resp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS; Description: by DOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING SOCIAL SEC NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: PETITION FOR SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FL DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHARLES W RUPPEL