This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/16/2022 at 22:19:27 (UTC).

FIRST HEALTH WINTER SPRINGS LLC AAO HOSHYAR KHOSHESPERAM V. ATLANTIC CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 FIRST HEALTH WINTER SPRINGS LLC AAO HOSHYAR KHOSHESPERAM filed an Other lawsuit against ATLANTIC CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wesley Heidt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wesley Heidt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FIRST HEALTH WINTER SPRINGS LLC AAO HOSHYAR KHOSHESPERAM

HOSHYAR KHOSHESPERAM

KIMBERLY SIMOES P A

Deland, FL 32720

Defendant

ATLANTIC CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBERLY P SIMOES

Attorney at KIMBERLY P SIMOES P A

910 Sw 1St Ave Suite 200

Ocala, FL 34471

Defendant Attorney

MORGAN SPECTOR

Trade Centre South Ste 700, 100 W Cypress Creek Rd

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33309

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/16/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/16/2021 : COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SERVICE

11/16/2021 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

REQUEST SUMMONS

11/16/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

11/17/2021 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

12/06/2021 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/15/2021 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/15/2021 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/15/2021 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/15/2021 : REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/15/2021 : NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/15/2021 : MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/15/2021 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/21/2021 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

12/30/2021 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

01/17/2022 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/o prej by First Health Winter Springs LLC aao Hoshyar Khoshesperam Instrument: 2022013939 Book: 8189 Page: 4213

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Atlantic Casualty Ins Co w/affirmative defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Morgan F Spector,Esq obo Atlantic Casualty Insurance Co and designation of email address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: Kimberly P Simoes obo First Health Winter Springs LLC etc and email designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: First Health Winter Springs LLC etc to deposit disputed funds into reg of court or compel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: First Health Winter Springs LLC etc of Rule 1.310(b)(6) depo request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: First Health Winter Springs LLC etc for inspection of orig docs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: (1st) to Atlantic Casualty Ins Co by First Health Winter Springs LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (1st) to Atlantic Casualty Ins Co by First Health Winter Springs LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: (1st) to Atlantic Casualty Ins Co by First Health Winter Springs LLC etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: WHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: by CFO obo Atlantic Casualty Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To ATLANTIC CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY rtn to Ptf's Atty via e service for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: Atlantic Casualty Insurance COmpany

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: CMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST HEALTH WINTER SPRINGS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ATLANTIC CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPECTOR, MORGAN FAIRTHORNE