This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 11/05/2021 at 18:31:36 (UTC).

FIRST CITIZENS BANK & TRUST COMPANY SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO HOMEBANC F K A HOMEBANC N A V. AMERICAN GERIATRIC CARE GROUP LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 FIRST CITIZENS BANK TRUST COMPANY SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO HOMEBANC F K A HOMEBANC N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMERICAN GERIATRIC CARE GROUP LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Leah R. Case. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Leah R. Case

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FIRST CITIZENS BANK & TRUST COMPANY SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO HOMEBANC F K A HOMEBANC N A

HOMEBANC

HOMEBANC N A

LENNOX LAW P A

Defendants

AMERICAN GERIATRIC CARE GROUP LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

FRANK DAVID BELLOTTI III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASEY REEDER LENNOX

Attorney at LENNOX LAW PA

4905 S Westshore Blvd

Tampa, FL 33611

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

10/13/2021 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

10/12/2021 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

10/08/2021 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

10/08/2021 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

10/07/2021 : REQUEST SUMMONS

COMPLAINT

10/06/2021 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/06/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by First Citizens Bank & Trust Company etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To FRANK DAVID BELLOTTI, III, AN INDIVIDUAL forwarded to plaintiff's attorney via e-service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To AMERICAN GERIATRIC CARE GROUP, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY forwarded to plaintiff's attorney via e-service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 20.00; Credits: -20.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: To American Geriatric Care Group and Frank David Bellotti III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOMEBANC NA is a litigant

Latest cases where First Citizens Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LENNOX , CASEY REEDER