This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 08/13/2022 at 20:24:33 (UTC).

EXPRESS CARE OF BELLEVIEW LLC AAO JHEROD T STYLES V. HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 EXPRESS CARE OF BELLEVIEW LLC AAO JHEROD T STYLES filed an Other lawsuit against HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Rachel D. Myers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Rachel D. Myers

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EXPRESS CARE OF BELLEVIEW LLC AAO JHEROD T STYLES

BLOODWORTH LAW PLLC

Orlando, FL 32803

JHEROD T STYLES

Defendant

HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL J LAPORTE

Attorney at BLOODWORTH LAW PLLC

801 N Magnolia Avenue Ste 216

Orlando, FL 32803

Defendant Attorney

KRISTEN E TAYLOR

Law Offices Of Jason L Weissman, 200 Colonial Center Pkwy Ste 346

Lake Mary, FL 32746

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/27/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

06/27/2022 : COMPLAINT

NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

06/27/2022 : NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

REQUEST SUMMONS

06/27/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

06/29/2022 : PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

07/11/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/18/2022 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

08/03/2022 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to complaint by Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: of Kristen E Taylor Esq obo Hartford Ins Co of the Southeast w/designation and demand for jury trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY; Description: CFO obo Hartford Ins Co of the Southeast

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST fwd to pltfs atty via e-service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Hartford Insurance etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: NOTICE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Express Care etc of Rule 1.310(B)(6) deposition request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EXPRESS CARE OF BELLEVIEW LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Taylor, Kristen E.