This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 01/16/2023 at 18:19:57 (UTC).

EVA SMITH V. DIANA RUTH PERSAUD

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 EVA SMITH filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DIANA RUTH PERSAUD. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert A. Sanders, Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Robert A. Sanders, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVA SMITH

Daytona Beach, FL 32117

Defendant

DIANA RUTH PERSAUD

Daytona Beach, FL 32117

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

01/10/2023 : WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

01/06/2023 : FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

NON-JURY TRIAL SHEET

01/03/2023 : NON-JURY TRIAL SHEET

ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL

12/14/2022 : ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL

DEFAULT

12/13/2022 : DEFAULT

MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

12/13/2022 : MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

12/12/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

DEFAULT

12/12/2022 : DEFAULT

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

12/12/2022 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

12/07/2022 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

11/29/2022 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

11/29/2022 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

CONSENT BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

11/28/2022 : CONSENT BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

11/28/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

11/28/2022 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

REQUEST SUMMONS

11/28/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

11/28/2022 : COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/28/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19); Docket Type: WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: iss'd fwd to vso w/mo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: agst Diana Ruth Persaud and $243.50 costs Instrument: 2023007196 Book: 8356 Page: 1412 View: 2023007196

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Non-Jury Trial; Court Officer: Robert A. Sanders, Jr.; Location: CI302, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled; Comments: (1/2hr)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: NON-JURY TRIAL SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL; Description: (NJ)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Diana Ruth Persaud (Amended for date correction)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE; Description: Matter will be scheduled for NON-Jury Trial by Separate Order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Diana Ruth Persaud

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: Diana Ruth Persaud

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: Diana Ruth Persaud

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 3.50; Final Amount: 3.50; Credits: -3.50; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: complaint and summons to DIANA RUTH PERSAUD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To DIANA RUTH PERSAUD fwd to VSO w/$40mo for sop, cc Pltf by mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: CONSENT BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Eva Smith to case closure after 90 days of inactivity

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: Eva Smith

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: Diana Ruth Persaud

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: Diana Ruth Persaud

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: possession - unlawful detainer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less