This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 02/27/2022 at 00:18:44 (UTC).

ESTATE OF ROBERT SAKOWSKI

Case Summary

On 12/21/2021 ESTATE OF ROBERT SAKOWSKI was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Margaret W. Hudson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********PRDL

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Margaret W. Hudson

 

Party Details

Petitioners

DOROTHY REGINA FOROWSKI

Farmingdale, NY 11735

STEPHANIE ELIZABETH SAKOWSKI

Port Saint Lucie, FL 34983

Not Classified By Court

ROBERT SAKOWSKI

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WILLIAM S FRAZIER

1919 Blanding Blvdste 8

Jacksonville, FL 32210

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 9; Unit Amount: 1.00; Final Amount: 9.00; Credits: -9.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 3; Unit Amount: 2.00; Final Amount: 6.00; Credits: -6.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: ORDER OF/FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION; Description: Intestate Instrument: 2022005510 Book: 8184 Page: 1726

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: Summary Intestate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 345.00; Final Amount: 345.00; Credits: -345.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH; Description: Robert Sakowski, E-filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION; Description: of Heirs by Stephanie Elizabeth Sakowski

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: PETITION OF/FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION; Description: Intestate

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frazier, William Stafford