This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 12/19/2022 at 05:24:53 (UTC).

ESTATE OF ROBERT CURTIS SCHAEFFER

Case Summary

On 11/08/2022 ESTATE OF ROBERT CURTIS SCHAEFFER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Margaret W. Hudson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********PRDL

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Margaret W. Hudson

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JEFFREY SCHAEFFER

Douglassville, PA 19518

Not Classified By Court

ROBERT CURTIS SCHAEFFER

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JERRY B WELLS

127 Magnolia Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2022
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: RESPONSE; Description: to Judge's OR dtd 12/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: ORDER DENYING; Description: Formal * E-svd w/wksht

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: Formal Testate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: OATH OF WITNESS WITH COPY OF WILL; Description: by J.R. Stewart

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: OATH OF WITNESS WITH COPY OF WILL; Description: by J.R. Stewart

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 3.50; Final Amount: 3.50; Credits: -3.50; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT; Description: dtd 07/08/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH; Description: Ray E. Midkiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH; Description: Robert Curtis Schaeffer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: COPY; Description: of Declaration of Trust

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: COPY; Description: of Will DTD 07/08/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: OATH OF/BY DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE; Description: Jerry B Wells Esq by Jeffrey Schaeffer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH; Description: Roy E Midkiff (E-Filed) Not Legible

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH; Description: Robert Curtis Scgaeffer (E-Filed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: PETITION OF/FOR ADMINISTRATION; Description: Testate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less