This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 03/26/2023 at 23:11:55 (UTC).

ESTATE OF MARY ELIZABETH PALMER, ETC.

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 ESTATE OF MARY ELIZABETH PALMER, ETC was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is James R. Clayton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********PRDL

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

James R. Clayton

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

MARY ELIZABETH PALMER

Edgewater, FL 32141

JAMES C PETERSON

New Smyrna Beach, FL 32168

MARY E PALMER

MARY PALMER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

ALEXANDER J KOLLMER

Attorney at PETERSON LAW GROUP PLLC

418 Canal Street

New Smyrna Beach, FL 32168

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2023
  • Docket(#23); Docket Type: RECEIPT NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION; Description: Formal Ntc, Ntc to Creditors, Aff of No Tax, Ntc of Trust and Inventory by Gerald Arceneaux as Benef & Trust Benef

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • Docket(#22); Docket Type: RECEIPT NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION; Description: Formal Ntc, Ntc to Creditors, Aff of No Tax, Ntc of Trust and Inventory by Melody Arceneaux as Benef & Trust Benef

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • Docket(#21); Docket Type: RECEIPT NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION; Description: Formal Ntc, Ntc to Creditors, Aff of No Tax, Ntc of Trust and Inventory by Sharon Robling, as Benef & Trust Benef

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • Docket(#20); Docket Type: RECEIPT NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION; Description: Ntc. to Creditors, Inventory, Affd. of No tax, & Ntc. of Trust by Christine Charron

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • Docket(#19); Docket Type: RECEIPT NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION; Description: Ntc. to Creditors, Inventory, Affd. of No tax, & Ntc. of Trust by Southeast Humane Society

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: RECEIPT NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION; Description: Ntc. to Creditors, Inventory, Affd. of No tax, & Ntc. of Trust by First Baptist Church of New Smyrna Beach

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: PROOF OF SERVICE; Description: Ntc. of Admn., Inventory, Ntc. to Creditors w/evidence of delivery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: PROOF OF SERVICE; Description: Ntc. to Creditors w/evidence of delivery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: INVENTORY; Description: Estate Assets

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: FORMAL NOTICE NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION; Description: Ntc to Creditors, Aff of No FL Tax Due and Inventory

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 10; Unit Amount: 1.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: LETTER(S) OF/FOR ADMINISTRATION; Description: Instrument: 2022264400 Book: 8340 Page: 429 View: 2022264400

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: ORDER TO ADMIT WILL & APPT. P.R.; Description: James C. Peterson, Bond Waived Instrument: 2022264399 Book: 8340 Page: 428 View: 2022264399

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: Formal Testate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT WITH PROOF THEREIN; Description: dtd 5/5/2021 w/blank seperate writing (11 pgs) (rec) Instrument: 2022264398 Book: 8340 Page: 417 View: 2022264398

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: A copy of the Revocable Trust of Mary Elizabeth Palmer (attached).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: OATH OF/BY DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE; Description: Alexander J Kollmer Esq by James C Peterson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH; Description: Mary Elizabeth Palmer (E-Filed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: PETITION OF/FOR ADMINISTRATION; Description: Testate With Attachments of Death Cert Revocable Trust

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less