This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 02/05/2023 at 17:03:13 (UTC).

ESTATE OF JOHN PHILLIP CRISP, ETC.

Case Summary

On 10/19/2022 ESTATE OF JOHN PHILLIP CRISP, ETC was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is James R. Clayton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********PRDL

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

James R. Clayton

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

JOHN PHILLIP CRISP

New Smyrna Beach, FL 32168

MAX REED

Port Orange, FL 32128

JOHN P CRISP

JOHN CRISP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

ALEXANDER J KOLLMER

Attorney at PETERSON LAW GROUP PLLC

418 Canal Street

New Smyrna Beach, FL 32168

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 2.00; Final Amount: 4.00; Credits: -4.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 4; Unit Amount: 1.00; Final Amount: 4.00; Credits: -4.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • Docket(#19); Docket Type: LETTER(S) OF/FOR ADMINISTRATION; Description: Instrument: 2023013600 Book: 8359 Page: 2912 View: 2023013600

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: ORDER TO ADMIT LOST OR DESTROYED WILL; Description: Instrument: 2023013595 Book: 8359 Page: 2894 View: 2023013595

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: ORDER TO ADMIT WILL & APPT. P.R.; Description: Max Reed *No Bond Instrument: 2023013596 Book: 8359 Page: 2903 View: 2023013596

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: Follow Up Formal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: AMENDED MOTION/PETITION/COMPLAINT OF/FOR ADMINISTRATION; Description: Testate w/Copy of Trust Agreement dtd 01/23/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: ORDER DENYING; Description: Formal *E-svd w/wkshts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: Establish Lost or Destroyed Will

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: Formal Testate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2022
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: PROOF OF SERVICE; Description: of Pet for Lost/Destroyed Will and Formal Ntc thereof w/evidence of delivery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: PROOF OF SERVICE; Description: Fml. Ntc. w/evidence of delivery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 3.50; Final Amount: 3.50; Credits: -3.50; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: OATH OF WITNESS WITH COPY OF WILL; Description: by Sharon Ritton

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: FORMAL NOTICE; Description: Pet for probate of Lost/Destroyed Will

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: PETITION TO ADMIT LOST OR DESTROYED WILL; Description: w/copy of Will dtd 01/23/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: OATH OF/BY DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE; Description: Alexander J Kollmer Esq by Max Reed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH; Description: John Phillip Crisp (E-Filed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: PETITION OF/FOR ADMINISTRATION; Description: Testate W/ attachment of Trust

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less