Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 04/01/2021 at 18:36:30 (UTC).

ERNEST E WATKINS V. SECRETARY FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 ERNEST E WATKINS filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against SECRETARY FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Stasia Warren and Sandra C. Upchurch. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Stasia Warren

Sandra C. Upchurch

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERNEST E WATKINS

Defendant

SECRETARY FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

03/18/2021 : ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/03/2021 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS

03/02/2021 : PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Description: to Florida Department of Corrections w/in 90 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: COPY OF LETTER; Description: to Ernest E Watkins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: COPY OF LETTER; Description: Ernest E Watkins (incorrect Division and Judge on letter; will resend)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Description: (emailed to JA 03/15/2021 CA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECRETARY, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS is a litigant