This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 09/25/2020 at 00:01:25 (UTC).

EMERGENCY MEDICINE PROFESSIONALS P A, ETC. V. METROPOLITAN CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/11/2017 EMERGENCY MEDICINE PROFESSIONALS P A, ETC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against METROPOLITAN CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are David A. Cromartie and Christopher Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

David A. Cromartie

Christopher Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TOM PILCHER

BRADFORD CEDERBERG P A

EMERGENCY MEDICINE PROFESSIONALS P A

Defendant

METROPOLITAN CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID B ALEXANDER

Attorney at BRADFORD CEDERBERG PA

2900 E Robinson St

Orlando, FL 32803

Defendant Attorney

RANDALL A WAINORIS

Attorney at DUTTON LAW GROUP P A

Po Box 260697

Tampa, FL 33685

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

07/09/2019 : NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

06/19/2019 : NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

06/10/2019 : NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT / PETITION

07/26/2018 : MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT / PETITION

MOTION TO COMPEL

04/10/2018 : MOTION TO COMPEL

ORDER TO SET / SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT

11/01/2017 : ORDER TO SET / SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

07/12/2017 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

07/03/2017 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/05/2017 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING

09/23/2020 : NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING

NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING

09/23/2020 : NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING

NOTICE OF FILING

09/17/2020 : NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

09/17/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

NOTICE OF FILING

09/16/2020 : NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE OF FILING

09/16/2020 : NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

09/09/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

08/06/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/10/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Christopher Kelly; Location: CKZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled; Comments: (amd) pltf mtn to amd complaint, compel depo of corp rep & protective order, mtn for sanctions & dfnt Mtn to compel & sanction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING; Description: by Metropolitan Casualty Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER OF CANCELING OF/FOR HEARING; Description: by Emergency Medicine Professionals PA etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: (part 2 of 2)Authority surrounding hearing on 09/23/2020 by Emergency Medicine Professionals PA etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: (part 1 of 2)Authority surrounding hearing on 09/23/2020 by Emergency Medicine Professionals PA etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING; Description: (2nd Amd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: Hearing Notebook by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: Hearing Notebook by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING; Description: 2nd amended as to Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR HEARING; Description: (Amd)zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Co by Emergency Medicine Professionals,P.A.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Co by Emergency Medicine Professionals,P.A.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Co by Emergency Medicine Professionals,P.A.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by David B Alexander,Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 175.00; Final Amount: 175.00; Credits: -175.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; Description: To METROPOLITAN CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY Fwd pltf atty via e-service for sop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less