Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 04/18/2020 at 17:07:13 (UTC).

EILEEN DALTON V. SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 EILEEN DALTON filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Randell H. Rowe, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Randell H. Rowe, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOLTZ LEGAL

EILEEN DALTON

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROOKE L BOLTZ

Boltz Legal Po Box 620578

Oviedo, FL 32762

Defendant Attorney

MATTHEW BERNSTEIN

Vernis & Bowling Of Central Fl 1450 S Woodland Blvd 4Th Fl

Deland, FL 32720

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

04/08/2020 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

04/08/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

OBJECTION BY/FOR DEFENDANT

03/28/2020 : OBJECTION BY/FOR DEFENDANT

ORDER DIRECTING

03/27/2020 : ORDER DIRECTING

MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

03/25/2020 : MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

01/31/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

01/31/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE

01/31/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/16/2020 : REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

01/09/2020 : NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

01/03/2020 : STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

12/13/2019 : MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

11/22/2019 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

11/22/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/22/2019 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/22/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

11/22/2019 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

COMPLAINT

11/22/2019 : COMPLAINT

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej by Eileen Dalton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Docket Type: OBJECTION BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Security First Insurance Company to pltf's mtn to enforce settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Docket Type: OBJECTION BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Security First Insurance Company to pltf's mtn to enforce settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Docket Type: ORDER DIRECTING; Description: dfnt to file response to mtn to enforce settlement by 03-30-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Docket Type: MOTION BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Eileen Dalton to enforce settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: NOTICE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Security First of privilege log

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Security First to req to produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Security First to req for admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: answers to interrogs by Security First

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY fwd to pltf's atty via eservice for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Security First Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Security First Insurance Company by Eileen Dalton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Security First Insurance Company by Eileen Dalton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to Security First Insurance Company by Eileen Dalton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Brooke Boltz, Esquire

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOLTZ LEGAL is a litigant

Latest cases where Security First Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOLTZ BROOKE L