Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 08/30/2020 at 00:25:40 (UTC).

EDWARD D SCHWINGE V. KIM SCHWINGE

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 EDWARD D SCHWINGE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KIM SCHWINGE. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Stasia Warren. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********FMCI

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Stasia Warren

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EDWARD D SCHWINGE

Respondent

KIM SCHWINGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SUSANNE D MCCABE

900 N Swallowtail Drive Suite 101

Port Orange, FL 32129

Respondent Attorney

LINDA D CARLEY

435 S Ridgewood Ave Ste 205

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Stasia Warren; Location: SWZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docket(#41) Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • Docket(#40) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER FOR CASE MGMT CONF.; Description: amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • Docket(#39) Docket Type: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Description: by atty Susanne D McCabe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • Docket(#38) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of answers to 1st set of interrogs on pet 05/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • Docket(#37) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: response to 1st set of interrogs by resp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • Docket(#36) Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER FOR CASE MGMT CONF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • Docket(#35) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: served pet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Stasia Warren; Location: CI-11, City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2020
  • Docket(#34) Docket Type: ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT; Description: mediation set

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2019
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: resp 11/14/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 408.00; Final Amount: 408.00; Credits: -408.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: as to PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE To KIM SCHWINGE Orig/e-served to Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE DIST PARENTING NOTICE/STANDING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS; Description: by Edward D Schwinge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING SOCIAL SEC NUMBER; Description: Edward D Schwinge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUSANNE D MCCABE