This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 08/02/2022 at 17:41:05 (UTC).

E JACOB M D P A PATIENT ROLINA BEAN V. PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 E JACOB M D P A PATIENT ROLINA BEAN filed an Other lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wesley Heidt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wesley Heidt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

E JACOB M D P A PATIENT ROLINA BEAN

ROLINA BEAN

GED LAWYERS LLP

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD CHRISTENSEN

Attorney at GED LAWYERS LLP

7171 N Federal Highway

Boca Raton, FL 33487

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

06/16/2022 : COMPLAINT

REQUEST SUMMONS

06/16/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

06/20/2022 : PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/05/2022 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

07/21/2022 : NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/27/2022 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

07/27/2022 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: CI-7, City Island Courthouse; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-Trial; Court Officer: Wesley Heidt; Location: WHZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Cancelled; Comments: Summons Exec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej by E Jacob MD PA etc Instrument: 2022179283 Book: 8291 Page: 2151 View: 2022179283

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; Description: by E.Jacob,M.D.,P.A.,etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Description: CFO obo Progressive Direct Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 55.00; Final Amount: 55.00; Credits: -55.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL REMOTE SUMMONS ISSUED; Description: To PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY forwarded to plaintiff's attorney via e-service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Progressive Direct Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GED LAWYERS LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive Direct Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTENSEN , CHAD