This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 03/12/2023 at 04:09:20 (UTC).

DOREEN FLAHERTY V. WILBER PEREZ

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 DOREEN FLAHERTY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WILBER PEREZ. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Rachel D. Myers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Rachel D. Myers

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DOREEN FLAHERTY

PETERSON LAW GROUP

New Smyrna Beach, FL 32168

Defendant

WILBER PEREZ

Orange City, FL 32763

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALEXANDER J KOLLMER

Attorney at PETERSON LAW GROUP PLLC

418 Canal Street

New Smyrna Beach, FL 32168

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/04/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

11/04/2022 : COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

11/07/2022 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

11/07/2022 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

11/21/2022 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

11/21/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF FILING

11/22/2022 : NOTICE OF FILING

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

11/22/2022 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

12/05/2022 : MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

12/19/2022 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

COPY OF LETTER

12/22/2022 : COPY OF LETTER

MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

01/20/2023 : MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT

ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL

01/25/2023 : ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL

NOTICE OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION

02/02/2023 : NOTICE OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION

MEDIATION SUMMARY / DISPO. REPORT

02/13/2023 : MEDIATION SUMMARY / DISPO. REPORT

STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

02/13/2023 : STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Non-Jury Trial; Court Officer: Rachel D. Myers; Location: D-314, DeLand; Status: Cancelled; Comments: 30 min

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: STIPULATION FOR/OF PAYMENT(S); Description: agst Wilber Perez Instrument: 2023029933 Book: 8368 Page: 991 View: 2023029933

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: MEDIATION SUMMARY / DISPO. REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR MEDIATION/ARBITRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: ORDER OF/FOR TRIAL; Description: NJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: as to Wilber Perez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: COPY OF LETTER; Description: to Peterson Law Group PLLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: MOTION OF/FOR DEFAULT; Description: as to Wilber Perez w/prop default (Need Judicial Default)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE; Description: no further action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Doreen Flaherty to dfnt's ans

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: Proof of Payment History by Wilber Perez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Wilber Perez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Wilber Perez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 185.00; Final Amount: 185.00; Credits: -185.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 5.00; Final Amount: 5.00; Credits: -5.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: complaint and summons to WILBER PEREZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To WILBER PEREZ fwd to pltfs atty via e-service for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: poss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less