Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 10/19/2020 at 21:48:08 (UTC).

DONYA TWYMAN V. MATTHEW BROWN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/10/2020 DONYA TWYMAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MATTHEW BROWN. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Randell H. Rowe, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Randell H. Rowe, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAN NEWLIN & PARTNERS

DONYA TWYMAN

Defendants

SUBURBAN PROPANE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

MATTHEW BROWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ETHAN M KIM

Dan Newlin & Partners 7335 W Sand Lake Road, Suite 300

Orlando, FL 32819

Defendant Attorney

THOMAS F BROWN

315 E Robinson St Ste 550

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE

08/17/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

08/17/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

08/17/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE

08/17/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR COPIES

07/31/2020 : REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE

07/21/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

07/21/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

CERTIFICATE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

07/13/2020 : CERTIFICATE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF/FOR COMPLIANCE

07/13/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR COMPLIANCE

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

04/21/2020 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

04/10/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

04/10/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/10/2020 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/10/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/10/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/10/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

COMPLAINT

04/10/2020 : COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/10/2020 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of answers to interrogs by Matthew Brown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Matthew Brown and Suburban Propane, Limited Partnership to request for production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Suburban Propane, Limited Partnership to request for admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: of unverified answers to interrogs by Suburban Propane, Limited Partnership

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR COPIES; Description: of all docs rcvd by Suburban Propane LP & Brown,Matthew pursuant to ntc of production by Donya Twyman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: answers to interrogs by Donya Twyman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Donya Twyman to req to produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Donya Twyman of non-objection to Notice of Production from Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR COMPLIANCE; Description: with request for copies by Matthew Brown and Suburban Propane Limited Partnership

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: MOTION FOR EXTENSION / EXTENDING TIME; Description: to respond to discovery requests by Donna Twyman

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To SUBURBAN PROPANE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP rtn to atty/sop via e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To MATTHEW BROWN rtn to atty/sop via e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: as to Suburban Propane Limited Partnership

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: as to Matthew Brown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to Suburban Propane Limited Partnership by Donya Twyman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to Matthew Brown and Suburban Propane Limited Partnership by Donya Twyman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: (1st) to Suburban Propane Limited Partnership by Donya Twyman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: (1st) to Matthew Brown by Donya Twyman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Suburban Propane is a litigant

Latest cases where DAN NEWLIN & PARTNERS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM ETHAN M