This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 10/13/2020 at 17:29:41 (UTC).

DIAMOND M INC DBA WISEFLY AUTO GLASS AAO ANTHONY RICHARDSON V. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 DIAMOND M INC DBA WISEFLY AUTO GLASS AAO ANTHONY RICHARDSON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Dawn P. Fields. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********COCI

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Dawn P. Fields

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANTHONY RICHARDSON

DIAMOND M INC DBA WISEFLY AUTO GLASS AAO ANTHONY RICHARDSON

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Not Classified By Court

WISEFLY AUTO GLASS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Plaintiff Attorney

DONALD J MASTEN

Po Box 4449

Orlando, FL 32802

Defendant Attorney

ALYSSA M KERSEY

1000 Legion Place Ste 850

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

OBJECTION BY/FOR DEFENDANT

05/29/2020 : OBJECTION BY/FOR DEFENDANT

MOTION TO COMPEL

03/20/2020 : MOTION TO COMPEL

MOTION TO COMPEL

01/13/2020 : MOTION TO COMPEL

MOTION TO COMPEL

01/13/2020 : MOTION TO COMPEL

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/13/2020 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

MOTION TO COMPEL

01/12/2020 : MOTION TO COMPEL

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

01/08/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

01/08/2020 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE

01/08/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/20/2019 : REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

12/19/2019 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/17/2019 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/17/2019 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

11/25/2019 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

OBJECTION BY/FOR DEFENDANT

11/25/2019 : OBJECTION BY/FOR DEFENDANT

OBJECTION BY/FOR DEFENDANT

11/25/2019 : OBJECTION BY/FOR DEFENDANT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/14/2019 : REQUEST TO PRODUCE

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/14/2019 : STATEMENT OF CLAIM

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) Docket Type: MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: (partial) by Diamond M Inc etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) Docket Type: MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT; Description: (partial) by Diamond M Inc etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) Docket Type: MOTION TO COMPEL; Description: depo of corp rep & appoint special master/magistrate by Diamond M Inc etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) Docket Type: MOTION TO COMPEL; Description: depo of corp rep & appoint special master/magistrate by Diamond M Inc etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) Docket Type: REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Diamond M Inc etc to take judicial notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) Docket Type: REQUEST BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Diamond M Inc etc to take judicial notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) Docket Type: OBJECTION BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Geico General Insurance Company, to plaintiff's notice of taking deposition duces tecum for June 2,2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) Docket Type: OBJECTION BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: Geico General Insurance Company, to plaintiff's notice of taking deposition duces tecum for June 2,2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) Docket Type: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: (amd)(via WEBEX) Corp Rep of Geico

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) Docket Type: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Description: (amd)(via WEBEX) Corp Rep of Geico

    Read MoreRead Less
125 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (Safelite)to Geico etc by Geico etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (3rd party software programs utilized)to Geico etc by Diamond M Inc etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (3rd party software programs utilized)to Geico etc by Diamond M Inc etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (claims procedures)to Geico etc by Diamond M Inc etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (claims procedures)to Geico etc by Diamond M Inc etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (initial)to Geico etc by Diamond M Inc etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: (initial)to Geico etc by Diamond M Inc etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Donald J Masten

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Donald J Masten

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less