This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 01/15/2021 at 18:32:45 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR INDYMAC INDX MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2005 AR19, ETC. V. CARMEN A MOORE, ETC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/16/2020 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR INDYMAC INDX MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2005 AR19, ETC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CARMEN A MOORE, ETC . This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary G. Jolley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CICI

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Mary G. Jolley

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MCCABE WEISBERG & CONWAY LLC

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR INDYMAC INDX MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2005 AR19

Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CARMEN A MOORE A K A CARMEN MOORE

CARMEN A MOORE

INDYMAC BANK F S B

GEORGETOWNE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF DAYTONA BEACH INC

CIT BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO INDYMAC BANK F S B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT A MCLAIN

Attorney at MCCABE WEISBERG & CONWAY LLC

500 S Australian Ave Ste 1000

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

12/30/2020 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

12/30/2020 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

12/30/2020 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

12/30/2020 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

12/27/2020 : ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

12/23/2020 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/16/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/16/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/16/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/16/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

12/16/2020 : MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

CERTIFICATE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/16/2020 : CERTIFICATE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

12/16/2020 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

WORKSHEET

12/16/2020 : WORKSHEET

COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

12/16/2020 : COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/16/2020 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To CIT BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO INDYMAC BANK, F.S.B. fwd to pltf atty via e-service for SOP; cc pltf atty via e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To GEORGETOWNE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF DAYTONA BEACH, INC. fwd to pltf atty via e-service for SOP; cc pltf atty via e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CARMEN A. MOORE A/K/A CARMEN MOORE fwd to pltf atty via e-service for SOP; cc pltf atty via e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To CARMEN A. MOORE A/K/A CARMEN MOORE fwd to pltf atty via e-service for SOP; cc pltf atty via e-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11.5) Docket Type: ORDER TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 905.00; Final Amount: 905.00; Credits: -905.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 4; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 40.00; Credits: -40.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 5.00; Final Amount: 5.00; Credits: -5.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 1.00; Final Amount: 2.00; Credits: -2.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: with money attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to CIT Bank, National Association etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Georgetown Homeowners Association of Daytona Beach, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Unknown Spouse of Carmen A. Moore etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Carmen A. Moore etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company etc w/o prop order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company etc of original note of possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2020249923 Book: 7962 Page: 1402

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: for Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCCABE WEISBERG & CONWAY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where INDYMAC BANK, F.S.B. is a litigant

Latest cases where CIT Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant