This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 09/10/2020 at 01:23:51 (UTC).

DEUTCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY ABS CAPITAL I INC TRUST 2007, ETC. V. MICHAEL RAMSEY, ETC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 DEUTCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY ABS CAPITAL I INC TRUST 2007, ETC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MICHAEL RAMSEY, ETC . This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathryn Weston. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kathryn Weston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MCCABE WEISBERG & CONWAY LLC

DEUTCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY ABS CAPITAL I INC TRUST 2007

Defendants

TANIKA WILLIAMS

M RAMSEY

MICHAEL M RAMSEY

BRENDA RAMSEY

MICHAEL RAMSEY

Not Classified By Court

UNKNOWN HEIRS ETC AGST EST OF RUBYE DOWDELL

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL RAMSEY

Guardian Ad Litem

JULIA B KITE POWELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT A MCLAIN

Attorney at MCCABE WEISBERG & CONWAY LLC

500 S Australian Ave Ste 1000

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Not Classified By Court Attorney

JULIA B KITE-POWELL

Po Box 18645

Tampa, FL 33679-8645

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

09/01/2020 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

09/01/2020 : NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF SERVICE

08/26/2020 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

08/25/2020 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NOTICE OF ACTION

08/25/2020 : NOTICE OF ACTION

MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AND/OR ATTY AD LITEM

08/24/2020 : MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AND/OR ATTY AD LITEM

PROPOSED

08/21/2020 : PROPOSED

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION DILIGENT SEARCH / CONSTRUCTIVE SVC

08/21/2020 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION DILIGENT SEARCH / CONSTRUCTIVE SVC

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

08/21/2020 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

NOTICE OF FILING

08/03/2020 : NOTICE OF FILING

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/03/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/03/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/03/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/03/2020 : REQUEST SUMMONS

WORKSHEET

08/03/2020 : WORKSHEET

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

08/03/2020 : NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

08/03/2020 : COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/03/2020 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Docket Type: NOTICE OF/FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Description: w/o prej by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company etc Instrument: 2020167402 Book: 7906 Page: 317

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: order granting mtn for appt of guardian ad litem by Deutsche Bank etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: of copy of ntc of action & complaint to The Unknown Heirs, etc agst The Estate of Rubye Dowdell etc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACTION; Description: to The Unknown Heirs, etc agst The estate of Rubye Dowdell etc., fwd to The West Volusia Beacon for publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docket(#23) Docket Type: ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AND/OR ATTY AD LITEM; Description: Julia B Kite-Powell Esq obo The Unknown Heirs, etc agst The estate of Rubye Dowdell etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AND/OR ATTY AD LITEM; Description: by Deustche Bank Nat'l Trust Co etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Docket Type: PROPOSED; Description: ntc of action (nothing to be completed until mailings rcvd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION DILIGENT SEARCH / CONSTRUCTIVE SVC; Description: as to Unk heirs etc agst Est of Rubye Dowdell etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Tanika Williams

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: MOTION TO APPT / APPOINTING PROCESS SERV.; Description: by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING; Description: Certificate of Possession of Original Note by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Tanika Williams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Brenda Ramsey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Unknown Spouse of Michael Ramsey AKA Michael M Ramsey AKA M Ramsey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to Michael Ramey AKA Michael M Ramsey AKA M Ramsey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: (Valuation)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Description: Instrument: 2020143726 Book: 7889 Page: 4438

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT / PETITION TO FORECLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCCABE WEISBERG & CONWAY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT A McLAIN