This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 01/30/2023 at 17:49:02 (UTC).

DAWN MCDONALD V. CORY PARKS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 DAWN MCDONALD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CORY PARKS,. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Rachel D. Myers. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CODL

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Rachel D. Myers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAWN MCDONALD

Edgewater, FL 32141

Defendants

CORY PARKS

Oak Hill, FL 32759

BRITTNEY SANFORD

Oak Hill, FL 32759

 

Court Documents

RETURNED WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

01/10/2023 : RETURNED WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

01/04/2023 : WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

01/04/2023 : FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

01/03/2023 : FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION

ORDER DENYING

12/22/2022 : ORDER DENYING

MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

12/22/2022 : MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/20/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

MOTION TO SET / SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT

12/20/2022 : MOTION TO SET / SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT

DEFAULT

12/19/2022 : DEFAULT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/05/2022 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

12/05/2022 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

CONSENT BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

12/01/2022 : CONSENT BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/01/2022 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

12/01/2022 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

REQUEST SUMMONS

12/01/2022 : REQUEST SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

12/01/2022 : COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/01/2022 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

INFORMATION SHEET

12/01/2022 : INFORMATION SHEET

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24); Docket Type: RETURNED WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: exec,turned over to Dawn McDonald

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23); Docket Type: WRIT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: iss'd, fwd to VSO w/ck #9097 $90.00 for SOP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22); Docket Type: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21); Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT OF/FOR POSSESSION; Description: (default) agst Cory Parks and Brittany Sanford & $388.50 cc Instrument: 2023004851 Book: 8355 Page: 788 View: 2023004851

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20); Docket Type: ORDER DENYING; Description: Dfnts Req to Set Aside Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19); Docket Type: MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE; Description: Court has reviewed Dfnts Req to Set Aside Default; Motion DENIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 0.15; Final Amount: 0.15; Credits: -0.15; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: Brittney Sanford

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: MOTION TO SET / SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT; Description: Brittney Sanford with Attached Notice of Filing, Answer/Paperwork

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: DEFAULT; Description: as to Cory Parks & Brittney Sanford

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To BRITTNEY SANFORD fwd to VSO w/$80ck for sop, cc Pltf by mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: complaint and summons to CORY PARKS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To CORY PARKS fwd to VSO w/$80ck for sop, cc Pltf by mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: CONSENT BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Dawn McDonald consent to case closure after 90 days of inactivity

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: Dawn McDonald

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: Cory Park, Brittney Sanford

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: Cory Parks, Brittney Sanford

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: Possession - Unlawful Detainer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less