Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 04/25/2020 at 12:03:16 (UTC).

DAVID JOHN MILLER V. AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 08/27/2019 DAVID JOHN MILLER filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Randell H. Rowe, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********CIDL

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Randell H. Rowe, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COHEN LAW GROUP

DAVID JOHN MILLER

Defendant

AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEAN P SCHULZ

Attorney at COHEN LAW GROUP PA

350 N Lake Destiny Rd

Maitland, FL 32751

Defendant Attorney

VALENCIA N POITIER

Po Box 26349

Tampa, FL 33623

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

04/08/2020 : ORDER OF DISMISSAL

STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL

04/03/2020 : STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL

EXHIBIT LIST BY/FOR DEFENDANT

10/29/2019 : EXHIBIT LIST BY/FOR DEFENDANT

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

10/28/2019 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

10/28/2019 : RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE

10/28/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE

MOTION TO STRIKE

10/21/2019 : MOTION TO STRIKE

REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/21/2019 : REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

10/01/2019 : ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/24/2019 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

09/15/2019 : NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/15/2019 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

09/15/2019 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

08/30/2019 : TWENTY DAY SUMMONS

REQUEST SUMMONS

08/27/2019 : REQUEST SUMMONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

08/27/2019 : NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/27/2019 : REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COMPLAINT

08/27/2019 : COMPLAINT

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Docket Type: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej Instrument: 2020072873 Book: 7841 Page: 4217

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; Description: w/prej

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: EXHIBIT LIST BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: (privilege log) American Integrity Insurance Company of Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: American Integrity Ins Co of Florida to req for admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: American Integrity Ins Co of Florida to 1st req for production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE; Description: unverified answers and objs to 1st set of interrogs by American Integrity Ins Co of Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: MOTION TO STRIKE; Description: various affirm defenses by David John Miller

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: REPLY OF/TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Description: by David John Miller

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: ANSWER BY/FOR DEFENDANT; Description: American Integrity Insurance Company w/affirm defenses and Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: Valencia N Poitier obo American Integrity Ins Co of Florida and email designation

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVICE ACCEPTED BY; Description: CFO obo American Integrity

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 400.00; Final Amount: 400.00; Credits: -400.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS; Description: To AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA ret to atty via e service for SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: REQUEST SUMMONS; Description: to American Integrity Ins Co of Fl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Description: to American Integrity Ins Co of Fl by David John Miller

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Description: to American Integrity Ins Co of Fl by David John Miller

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Description: to American Integrity Ins Co of Fl by David John Miller

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Integrity Insurance Company of Florida is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SEAN SCHULZ