This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/13/2023 at 09:24:48 (UTC).

DAMIAN DINHAM V. CHRISTINA DINHAM

Case Summary

On 03/01/2022 DAMIAN DINHAM filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CHRISTINA DINHAM. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Alex Alvarez and Stasia Warren. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********FMCI

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Alex Alvarez

Stasia Warren

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DAMIAN DINHAM

Ponce Inlet, FL 32127

Respondent

CHRISTINA DINHAM

Daytona Beach, FL 32117

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JENNIFER LABBE

11369 Okeechobee Blvd, Ste B150

Royal Palm Beach, FL 33411

Respondent Attorney

SILVIA S LOPEZ BARRERA

Community Legal Services Mid Florida Inc, 101 N Woodland Blvd, Ste 401

Deland, FL 32720

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Stasia Warren; Location: SWZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • Docket(#71); Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER FOR CASE MGMT CONF.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2023
  • Docket(#70); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Description: **limited** & designation of email by atty Jennifer Labbe obo pet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • Docket(#69); Docket Type: ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY; Description: atty James P Brunet obo pet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Stasia Warren; Location: SWZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • Docket(#68); Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • Docket(#67); Docket Type: ORDER REGARDING; Description: docket sounding

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • Docket(#66); Docket Type: ORDER GRANTING; Description: respondent to appear by zoom

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Docket Sounding; Court Officer: Stasia Warren; Location: City Island Courthouse; Status: Scheduled; Comments: pets atty may appear via zoom

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • Docket(#65); Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2022
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MASTER/MAGISTRATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 408.00; Final Amount: 408.00; Credits: -408.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 10.00; Final Amount: 10.00; Credits: -10.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: COPY OF LETTER; Description: to Damian Dinhim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE DIST PARENTING NOTICE/STANDING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS; Description: by Pet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE FOR REDACTION/CONFIDENTIALITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less